Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hipólito Salas y Toro

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1812Born
22 Nov 183523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
23 Jun 185441.8AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
29 Oct 185442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
Nov 1854³42.2InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
20 Jul 188370.9DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Hipólito Salas y Toro (VIAF: 89410677)
Bishop José Hipólito Salas y Toro (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Olivar, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 35
  • c1/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017