Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Vicuña Larraín

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1778BornSantiago
180324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 Dec 182850.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
22 Dec 182850.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
21 Mar 183051.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
2 Jul 183254.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
21 May 184062.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
21 Mar 184162.9InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
3 May 184365.0DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Manuel Vicuña Larraín:
Archbishop Manuel Vicuña Larraín (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 146, and Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013