Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Cienfuegos Arteaga

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1762Born
23 Sep 178623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
23 Dec 178624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 Dec 182866.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
15 Dec 182866.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
27 Dec 182866.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
17 Dec 183270.2AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
27 Apr 184077.5RetiredBishop of Concepción, Chile
8 Nov 184583.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Cienfuegos Arteaga (VIAF: 76259044)
Bishop José Ignacio Cienfuegos Arteaga (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSts. John and Paul, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceConcepción, Diocese of Concepción

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,828, Number 43
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast