Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

Archidioecesis Sanctissimae Concepionis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 May 1939
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 11,330 (4,376 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadodeconcepcion.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Calle Barros Arana 544, Casilla 65-C, Concepcion, Chile
  • Telephone: (041)62.06.70/3
  • Fax: 23.28.44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Concepción
22 March 1563ErectedDiocese of Santiago de Chile Diocese of Concepción (erected)
1 July 1840Territory LostDiocese of Concepción Diocese of San Carlos de Ancud (erected)
16 July 1901Territory LostDiocese of Concepción Prefecture Apostolic of Araucanía (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostDiocese of Concepción Diocese of Chillán (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostDiocese of Concepción Diocese of Temuco (erected)
18 October 1925Territory LostDiocese of Concepción Diocese of Linares (erected)
Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)
20 May 1939ElevatedDiocese of Concepción Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)
20 June 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)
Diocese of Temuco
Diocese of Los Angeles (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)
1950525,000530,00099.1%61631244,2338031040ap1951
1966680,000756,00089.9%56641205,6666735049ap1967
1970689,046798,70086.3%66731394,9577536051ap1971
1976729,834851,12585.7%50661166,29167032450ap1977
1980740,000885,00083.6%51671186,27167921154ap1981
1990751,9141,002,55475.0%50651156,53857424052ap1991
1999649,3101,150,00056.5%59641235,27876924653ap2000
2000649,3501,150,00056.5%60641245,236106824653ap2001
2001649,3501,150,00056.5%53661195,456117024653ap2002
2002655,0001,161,00056.4%67681354,851177224653ap2003
2003648,8001,150,00056.4%65641295,029176721952ap2004
2004599,1501,150,00052.1%69661354,438219420753ap2005
2006612,0001,176,00052.0%69601294,744298820753ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014