Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Sánchez Beguiristáin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1907BornIrún, Spain
21 Dec 192922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
17 Dec 195952.4AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
13 Mar 196052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
19 Mar 196052.7InstalledBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
25 Jun 196355.9AppointedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
4 Aug 196356.0InstalledArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
3 May 198375.8RetiredArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
2 Apr 198678.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile

MicroData Summary for Manuel Sánchez Beguiristáin:
Archbishop Manuel Sánchez Beguiristáin (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 15
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013