Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aloysius Joseph Cardinal Muench

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fargo, North Dakota

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1889BornMilwaukee
8 Jun 191324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
10 Aug 193546.4AppointedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
15 Oct 193546.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
6 Nov 193546.7InstalledBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
28 Oct 195061.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
9 Mar 195162.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
5 Dec 195970.7ResignedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
5 Dec 195970.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
14 Dec 195970.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 195970.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
15 Feb 196272.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Joseph Muench:
Aloysius Joseph Cardinal Muench (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fargo

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 28 Feb 2015