Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Opilio Cardinal Rossi

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1910BornNew York, NY, USA
11 Mar 193322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
21 Nov 195343.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
21 Nov 195343.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
27 Dec 195343.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
25 Mar 195948.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
25 Sep 196151.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
24 May 197666.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
24 May 197666.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 197666.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
10 Dec 197666.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
8 Apr 198473.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
22 Jun 198777.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
3 Jan 199180.6RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
9 Feb 200493.7DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses

MicroData Summary for Opilio Rossi:
Cardinal Opilio Rossi (born , died ) President Emeritus of International Eucharistic Congresses

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.1 years
  • a cardinal for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013