Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of New York

Archidioecesis Neo-Eboracensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Timothy Michael Dolan, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • John Samuel Bonnici, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Peter John Byrne, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Gerardo Joseph Colacicco, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joseph Armando Espaillat, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Edmund James Whalen, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Josu Iriondo Zabaleta, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • John Joseph Jenik, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Dominick John Lagonegro, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • James Francis McCarthy, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • John Joseph O’Hara, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Gerald Thomas Walsh, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 July 1850
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: New York
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 12,212 (4,716 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: II (NY)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: NY
  • Official Web Site: https://archny.org/
  • Mailing Address: 1011 First Ave., New York, NY 10022-4134, USA
  • Telephone: (212)794-2900
  • Fax: 826-6020

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of New York
8 April 1808ErectedDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Boston (erected) (Massachusetts, New Hampshire, Rhode Island, Connecticut, and Vermont)
Diocese of Bardstown (erected) (States of Kentucky, Tennessee, Ohio, and the Old Northwest Territory)
Diocese of New York (erected) (State of New York plus Sussex, Bergen, Morris, Essex, Somerset, Middlesex, and Monmouth counties in New Jersey)
Diocese of Philadelphia (erected) (Pennsylvania, Delaware, and 7 counties of New Jersey)
18 June 1834Territory AddedDiocese of New York (NY and parts of NJ (Sussex, Bergen, Morris, Essex, Somerset, Middlesex, and Monmouth))
23 April 1847Territory LostDiocese of New York Diocese of Albany (erected)
Diocese of Buffalo (erected)
Archdiocese of New York
19 July 1850ElevatedDiocese of New York Archdiocese of New York
29 July 1853Territory LostArchdiocese of New York Diocese of Brooklyn (erected) (Long Island)
29 July 1853Territory LostArchdiocese of New York
Diocese of Philadelphia
Diocese of Newark (erected) (State of New Jersey)
21 March 1929Territory LostArchdiocese of New York (Bahama islands) Prefecture Apostolic of Bahama (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of New York
19001,000,0004492276761,479259ce
19101,219,9206053249291,313331ce
19501,260,3284,900,00025.7%1,1149862,1006002,2647,246395ap1951
19621,651,4004,950,00033.4%1,2601,2732,5336511,2568,562403ap1967
19701,850,0005,500,00033.6%1,2101,4682,6786903,1587,444407ap1971
19761,880,7885,147,20036.5%1,3528372,189859311,8326,044407ap1977
19801,851,0005,077,00036.5%1,1461,3832,5297311162,0215,700410ap1981
19902,223,2905,115,00043.5%1,0061,4382,4449092861,9424,533412ap1991
19992,371,3555,254,30045.1%8821,0101,8921,2533204193,707413ap2000
20002,407,3935,276,40045.6%1,0069921,9981,2042771,5603,375412ap2001
20012,388,0475,276,90045.3%1,0239852,0081,1893431,4583,376412ap2002
20022,471,7425,492,76245.0%1,0179271,9441,2713541,4383,267411ap2003
20032,488,1465,529,21445.0%9358761,8111,3733541,4423,269411ap2004
20042,521,0875,602,41845.0%9229131,8351,3733591,4933,153409ap2005
20092,605,0005,789,00045.0%9328511,7831,4612901,3402,840370ap2010
20132,634,6245,854,72145.0%7697461,5151,7392921,2512,589368ap2014
20162,642,7405,872,75645.0%6965901,2862,0553199622,260368ap2017
20192,807,2986,238,44145.0%6545591,2132,3143889172,118288ap2020
20212,807,2986,238,44145.0%6655591,2242,2933758551,908284ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of New York
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 16 Jun 2024