Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Andrew Donnellan

Deceased

Archbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1914Born
3 Jun 193925.3Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
28 Feb 196450.0AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
9 Apr 196450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
24 May 196854.3AppointedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
16 Jul 196854.4InstalledArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
15 Oct 198773.7DiedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Andrew Donnellan (VIAF: 58622636)
Archbishop Thomas Andrew Donnellan (born , died ) Archbishop of Atlanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, New York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceSt. Joseph's Hospital, Atlanta, Archdiocese of Atlanta, Georgia

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017