Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlo Odescalchi, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Titular See: (Resigned as Cardinal and Bishop to enter the Jesuits)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1785BornRome
31 Dec 180823.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 182338.0AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
10 Mar 182338.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182338.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
25 May 182338.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
2 Jul 182641.3ResignedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
5 Feb 182842.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
22 Dec 183247.7AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
15 Apr 183348.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
15 Apr 183348.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
21 Nov 183449.7ResignedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
19 Dec 183449.7ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
30 Nov 183853.7ResignedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
30 Nov 183853.7ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
2 Feb 184054.9ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Aug 184156.4DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Carlo Odescalchi (VIAF: 79408090)
Father Carlo Odescalchi S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
  • a cardinal for 15.7 years (Resigned)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 17
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016