Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Di Macco

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1785BornLivorno
23 Dec 180924.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 183449.2SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
6 Apr 183549.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
26 Apr 183549.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
7 Aug 185468.9DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Di Macco:
Archbishop Antonio Di Macco (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013