Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cardinal-Deacons

by rank

RankVBirthdateAgeElevatedYrsThis DeaconryYrsNameCardinal Deaconry
172Yes5 Apr 1943 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Jean-Louis Pierre Cardinal TauranSant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
173No23 Nov 1932 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Renato Raffaele Cardinal MartinoSan Francesco di Paola ai Monti
174No25 Jun 1929 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Francesco Cardinal MarchisanoSanta Lucia del Gonfalone
175No31 Mar 1930 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Julián Cardinal Herranz CasadoSant’Eugenio
176No26 Jan 1933 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Javier Cardinal Lozano BarragánSan Michele Arcangelo
177Yes16 Mar 1937 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Attilio Cardinal NicoraSan Filippo Neri in Eurosia
178No25 Apr 1922 21 Oct 2003 21 Oct 2003 Georges Marie Martin Cardinal Cottier, O.P.Santi Domenico e Sisto
179Yes15 Jun 1936 24 Mar 2006 24 Mar 2006 William Joseph Cardinal LevadaSanta Maria in Domnica
180Yes23 Sep 1934 24 Mar 2006 24 Mar 2006 Franc Cardinal Rodé, C.M.San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella
181No27 Aug 1925 24 Mar 2006 24 Mar 2006 Andrea Cardinal Cordero Lanza di MontezemoloSanta Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
182No23 Jul 1923 24 Mar 2006 24 Mar 2006 Albert Cardinal Vanhoye, S.J.Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani
183Yes18 Nov 1943 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Leonardo Cardinal SandriSanti Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
184Yes3 Jan 1935 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Giovanni Cardinal LajoloSanta Maria Liberatrice a Monte Testaccio
185Yes5 Sep 1934 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Paul Josef Cardinal CordesSan Lorenzo in Piscibus
186Yes17 Sep 1943 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Angelo Cardinal ComastriSan Salvatore in Lauro
187Yes4 Jul 1945 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Stanisław Cardinal RyłkoSacro Cuore di Cristo Re
188No24 Sep 1933 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Raffaele Cardinal Farina, S.D.B.San Giovanni della Pigna
189No9 Nov 1925 24 Nov 2007 24 Nov 2007 Giovanni Cardinal CoppaSan Lino
190Yes8 Jun 1938 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Angelo Cardinal Amato, S.D.B.Santa Maria in Aquiro
191Yes15 Jun 1945 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Robert Cardinal SarahSan Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
192Yes28 May 1934 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Francesco Cardinal MonterisiSan Paolo alla Regola
193Yes30 Jun 1948 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Raymond Leo Cardinal BurkeSant’Agata de’ Goti
194Yes15 Mar 1950 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Kurt Cardinal KochNostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
195Yes1 Sep 1934 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Paolo Cardinal SardiSanta Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
196Yes15 Sep 1944 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Mauro Cardinal PiacenzaSan Paolo alle Tre Fontane
197Yes19 Sep 1935 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Velasio Cardinal De Paolis, C.S.Gesů Buon Pastore alla Montagnola
198Yes18 Oct 1942 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Gianfranco Cardinal RavasiSan Giorgio in Velabro
199No6 Jun 1928 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Elio Cardinal SgrecciaSant’Angelo in Pescheria
200No5 Jan 1929 20 Nov 2010 20 Nov 2010 Walter Cardinal BrandmüllerSan Giuliano dei Fiamminghi
201Yes15 Apr 1946 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Fernando Cardinal FiloniNostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio
202Yes29 Mar 1938 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Manuel Cardinal Monteiro de CastroSan Domenico di Guzman
203Yes21 Sep 1935 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Santos Cardinal Abril y CastellóSan Ponziano
204Yes3 Feb 1938 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Antonio Maria Cardinal VegliňSan Cesareo in Palatio
205Yes1 Oct 1942 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Giuseppe Cardinal BertelloSanti Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
206Yes6 Mar 1938 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Francesco Cardinal CoccopalmerioSan Giuseppe dei Falegnami
207Yes24 Apr 1947 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Joăo Cardinal Bráz de AvizSant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
208Yes8 Apr 1939 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Edwin Frederick Cardinal O’BrienSan Sebastiano al Palatino
209Yes3 Feb 1943 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Domenico Cardinal CalcagnoAnnunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina
210Yes30 Jul 1943 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Giuseppe Cardinal VersaldiSacro Cuore di Gesů a Castro Pretorio
211No24 Dec 1925 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Prospero (Stanley) Cardinal Grech, O.S.A.Santa Maria Goretti
212No18 Apr 1928 18 Feb 2012 18 Feb 2012 Karl Josef Cardinal Becker, S.J.San Giuliano Martire
213Yes20 Oct 1949 24 Nov 2012 24 Nov 2012 James Michael Cardinal HarveySan Pio V a Villa Carpegna
214Yes29 Sep 1940 22 Feb 2014 22 Feb 2014 Lorenzo Cardinal BaldisseriSant’Anselmo all’Aventino
215Yes31 Dec 1947 22 Feb 2014 22 Feb 2014 Gerhard Ludwig Cardinal MüllerSant’Agnese in Agone
216Yes18 Aug 1941 22 Feb 2014 22 Feb 2014 Beniamino Cardinal StellaSanti Cosma e Damiano
Notes: Cardinals that reach the age of 80 before the day the Holy See becomes vacant may not vote in a conclave.
Those currently eligible have 'Yes' in the column marked 'V'.
45 Cardinal-Deacons of 216 living Cardinals. This table was last updated on 9 Apr 2014.

Cardinal-Bishops

Cardinal-Priests

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Apr 2014