Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arthur Roche

Secretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1950 Born
19 Jul 197525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 200151.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 200151.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
10 May 200151.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
16 Jul 200252.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
7 Apr 200454.0SucceededBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
26 Jun 201262.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
26 Jun 201262.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)

MicroData Summary for Arthur Roche (VIAF: 305231218)
Archbishop Arthur Roche (born ) Secretary of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBatley Carr, Batley, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Batley Carr, Batley, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,976
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 May 2018

Quantcast