Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Congregatio de Cultu Divino et Disciplina Sacramentorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert Sarah, Cardinal, Prefect
  • Arthur Roche, Secretary
  • Francis Arinze, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus
  • Jorge Arturo Augustin Medina Estévez, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Congregation
  • United: 28 June 1988
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: does whatever pertains to the Apostolic See concerning the regulation and promotion of the sacred liturgy, primarily of the sacraments, without prejudice to the competence of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith. (Pastor Bonus, 62)
  • Section on the Vatican Website: http://www.vatican.va/roman_curia/congregations/ccdds/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo delle Congregazioni, 00193 Roma, Piazza Pio XII, 10
  • Telephone: 06.69.88.40.05; 06.69.88.44.16
  • Fax: 06.69.88.34.99

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
29 June 1908ErectedCongregation of Rites Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments (erected)
8 May 1969Territory LostCongregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments Congregation for Divine Worship (erected)
Congregation for Sacraments and Divine Worship
11 July 1975UnitedCongregation for Divine Worship
Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
Congregation for Sacraments and Divine Worship
Congregation of the Sacraments
5 April 1984SplitCongregation for Sacraments and Divine Worship Congregation of the Sacraments
Congregation for Divine Worship
Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
28 June 1988UnitedCongregation of the Sacraments
Congregation for Divine Worship
Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 24 Nov 2014