Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Geraldo Majella Cardinal Agnelo

Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

Cardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Magno alla Magliana Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1933 BornJuiz de Fora
29 Jun 195723.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
14 May 197844.5AppointedBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
6 Aug 197844.7Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
10 Sep 197844.8InstalledBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
4 Oct 198248.9AppointedArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
16 Sep 199157.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
13 Jan 199965.2AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
21 Feb 200167.3Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200167.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Magno alla Magliana Nuova
12 Jan 201177.2RetiredArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Majella Agnelo:
Geraldo Majella Cardinal Agnelo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2011
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015