Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Cascianelli, C.P.

Bishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1948 Born
7 Apr 197325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
5 Jul 200052.3AppointedBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil
23 Sep 200052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Cascianelli
Bishop Tommaso Cascianelli C.P. (born ) Bishop of Irecê

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapodimonte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Irecê.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,843

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast