Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czeslaw Stanula, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1940 Born
19 Jul 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Jun 198949.2AppointedBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
5 Nov 198949.6Ordained BishopBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
27 Aug 199757.4AppointedBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil
1 Feb 201776.8RetiredBishop of Itabuna, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Czeslaw Stanula
Bishop Czeslaw Stanula C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Itabuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzerzyny, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itabuna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,184
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: CB, 1 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Feb 2017