Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerzy Karol Ablewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Tarnów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1919BornKrosno
3 Mar 194323.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 196242.3AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
20 May 196242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
10 Jun 198767.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tarnów, Poland
31 Mar 199070.4DiedBishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Karol Ablewicz:
Archbishop Jerzy Karol Ablewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Tarnów

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 59
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1990, Page 655

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 16 Oct 2014