Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zygmunt Zimowski

President of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1949 BornKupienin
25 May 197324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
28 Mar 200253.0AppointedBishop of Radom, Poland
25 May 200253.1Ordained BishopBishop of Radom, Poland
18 Apr 200960.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
18 Apr 200960.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
28 Feb 201363.9CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers
16 Mar 201363.9ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Zimowski:
Archbishop Zygmunt Zimowski (born ) President of Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,190
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Apr 2014