Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Joseph von Stein

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1832BornAmorbach
2 May 185523.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
10 Aug 185523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
19 Oct 187846.5SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
28 Feb 187946.9ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
18 May 187947.1Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
24 Dec 189765.7SelectedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
12 Feb 189865.9ConfirmedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
18 Apr 189866.0InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
4 May 190977.1DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph von Stein:
Archbishop Franz Joseph von Stein (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 303, and Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013