Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Eichstätt

Dioecesis Eystettensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 745
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bamberg
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Germany
  • Square Kilometers: 6,025 (2,327 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bistum-eichstaett.de/
  • Mailing Address: Bischofliches Ordinariat, Luitpoldstr. 2, D-85072 Eichstatt, Bundesrepublik Deutschland
  • Telephone: (08421)500; 50.201
  • Fax: 50.209

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
745ErectedDiocese of Eichstätt (erected)
7 January 1930Territory AddedDiocese of Regensburg (Schönbrunn and Strasshaus) Diocese of Eichstätt
4 February 1939Territory AddedArchdiocese of Bamberg (North of Nuremberg)
Diocese of Eichstätt (South of Nuremberg)
2 May 1966Territory AddedDiocese of Regensburg (Reichertswin and Diesenhof of Pielenhofen along with Engelsberg, Finsterheid, Holzheim, Richthofen, and Prönsdorf of Utzenhofen) Diocese of Eichstätt
11 June 1968Territory AddedDiocese of Regensburg (Pollenhaid, Kugelhof, Hirschthal, and Auf der Höh) Diocese of Eichstätt

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950335,000613,00054.6%463995625962451,280220ap1951
1970402,000748,66253.7%4711005717041711,174250ap1971
1980437,285820,98053.3%387864739241481,267256ap1981
1990445,134814,70054.6%353924451,0004167939263ap1991
1999455,091876,16051.9%322713931,15718113602265ap2000
2000455,363907,00050.2%320703901,1674110578265ap2001
2001454,290890,00051.0%308683761,208100615265ap2002
2002453,229890,00050.9%316723881,16822104607265ap2003
2003453,229890,00050.9%304753791,19522103655265ap2004
2004450,062890,00050.6%308793871,16225106650265ap2005
2006442,772890,00049.7%299743731,18726103650265ap2007
2013413,155870,00047.5%300603601,1473978450263ap2014
2016401,767966,56441.6%303603631,1064377400260ap2017
2019396,902989,72540.1%287573441,1534768400258ap2020
2021386,798995,90838.8%275463211,2044457400259ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 152
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 197, and Page 198
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 273, to Page 275
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 166
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 263, and Page 264
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 447, and Page 448
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 60, Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Feb 2024