Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Mixa

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1941 BornKönigshütte
27 Jun 197029.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
24 Feb 199654.8AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Mar 199654.9Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
31 Aug 200059.3AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
16 Jul 200564.2AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1 Oct 200564.4InstalledBishop of Augsburg, Germany
8 May 201069.0ResignedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
8 May 201069.0ResignedBishop of Germany, Military

MicroData Summary for Walter Mixa:
Bishop Walter Mixa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Augsburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2005
  • r: Bollettino, 8 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,698

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013