Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josef Stimpfle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1916BornMaihingen
28 Jul 194630.3Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
10 Sep 196347.5AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
26 Oct 196347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
30 Mar 199276.0RetiredBishop of Augsburg, Germany
30 Mar 199276.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
12 Sep 199680.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Stimpfle:
Archbishop Josef Stimpfle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963, Number 114
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013