Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Augsburg

Dioecesis Augustana Vindelicorum



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bertram Johannes Meier, Bishop
  • Anton Losinger, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Florian Wörner, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Walter Mixa, Bishop Emeritus
  • Konrad Zdarsa, Bishop Emeritus
  • Josef Grünwald, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Augsburg (erected)
741Territory LostDiocese of Augsburg Diocese of Neuburg (erected)
801Territory AddedDiocese of Neuburg (suppressed) Diocese of Augsburg
1 April 1818Territory AddedDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} Diocese of Augsburg
Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
27 June 1930Territory AddedArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (House of Mathias Steurer) Diocese of Augsburg
11 November 1932Territory AddedArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (Territory of Petrus Hoeek) Diocese of Augsburg
19 December 1936Territory AddedDiocese of Regensburg (Forstwiesen) Diocese of Augsburg
9 April 1938Territory LostDiocese of Augsburg (Faistenberg and Hohenleiten) Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
21 April 1959Territory AddedArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (Family property of Joseph Scherm) Diocese of Augsburg

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
19501,347,0001,639,66082.2%1,2233481,5718573485,120986ap1951
19591,385,8031,657,37183.6%1,2533751,6288513455,215948ap1960
19701,500,5981,842,91181.4%1,1051,1051,35833,5001,020ap1971
19801,554,0001,900,00081.8%9603801,3401,159247164,4001,032ap1981
19901,457,4171,967,49874.1%8424251,2671,150817523,347997ap1991
19991,536,6202,195,12470.0%8181991,0171,5101074972,4271,000ap2000
20001,536,0102,204,62669.7%8131991,0121,5171133082,2391,000ap2001
20011,535,5292,214,18769.3%7932141,0071,5241203022,3151,001ap2002
20021,535,6692,225,16669.0%7923031,0951,4021185342,1971,001ap2003
20031,539,4612,245,15868.6%7893161,1051,3931244862,1151,001ap2004
20041,536,2942,249,02068.3%7823361,1181,3741294842,0501,001ap2005
20061,493,2822,262,96366.0%7623291,0911,3681385581,8371,001ap2007
20121,351,7032,298,45458.8%7113081,0191,3261585971,4481,004ap2013
20151,325,3162,316,27057.2%6664841,1501,1521647481,232998ap2016
20181,298,4822,401,29354.1%6472869331,3911735491,030998ap2019
20201,296,2002,438,24153.2%6242058291,5631813901,021996ap2021
20221,302,0002,460,07652.9%5932298221,583183491910996ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116, and Page 117
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 105
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 257, to Page 259
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 394
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 405
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 214
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 434, and Page 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 17 Feb 2024