Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Theodor von Guttenberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1652BornNeunkirchen
16 May 169340.9Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
1 Jul 171664.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
1 Jul 171664.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
6 Sep 171664.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
2 Jun 171765.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Theodor von Guttenberg:
Bishop Franz Theodor von Guttenberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 24.0 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015