Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Bichi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1668BornSiena, Italy
26 Apr 169931.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 170234.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
27 Dec 170234.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
5 Jan 170334.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
27 Sep 170941.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
2 Dec 170941.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Apr 1721³53.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
24 Sep 173163.6Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 173264.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
16 Dec 173769.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
29 Aug 174072.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
20 May 174375.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
23 Sep 174375.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
10 Apr 174779.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
11 Feb 175082.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bichi (VIAF: 89071109)
Vincenzo Cardinal Bichi (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
  • a cardinal for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1731
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 37
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,429
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016