Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Bernerio, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540²Born
22 Aug 158646.6AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
7 Sep 158646.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
16 Nov 158646.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158747.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
8 Nov 158949.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
17 Jun 160262.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
1603²63.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
16 Jun 160363.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
7 Jan 160565.0ResignedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
7 Feb 160767.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Aug 161171.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Bernerio (VIAF: 257504829)
Girolamo Cardinal Bernerio O.P. (born 1540, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorregio, Diocese of Modena, Italy
Ordained BishopXII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Giacinto chapel, S. Sabina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
  • a cardinal for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast