Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aurelio Novarini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1591AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
4 Aug 1591Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
1 Jul 1602AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
Sep 1606³DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Novarini
Archbishop Aurelio Novarini O.F.M. Conv. (died Sep 1606) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSs. Dominique et Sixte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 30, Number 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018