Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cardinal Electors


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
BirthdateAgeElevatedNameCurrent Title
30 Mar 195273.04 28 Nov 2020Jose Lazaro Fuerte Cardinal Advincula Jr.Archbishop of Manila, Philippines
9 Jan 195075.27 19 Nov 2016Carlos Cardinal Aguiar RetesArchbishop of México, Federal District
19 Apr 194579.99 18 Feb 2012George Cardinal AlencherryMajor Archbishop Emeritus of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India
12 Dec 197351.34 30 Sep 2023Américo Manuel Cardinal Alves AguiarBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
24 Jan 196065.23 5 Oct 2019Fridolin Cardinal Ambongo Besungu, O.F.M. Cap.Archbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Sep 194975.56 28 Jun 2017Anders Cardinal Arborelius, O.C.D.Bishop of Stockholm, Sweden
26 Dec 195866.30 27 Aug 2022Jean-Marc Noël Cardinal AvelineArchbishop of Marseille, France
24 Apr 194777.98 18 Feb 2012João Cardinal Bráz de AvizPrefect Emeritus of the Dicastery for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
15 Jan 196560.25 7 Dec 2024Fabio Cardinal Baggio, C.S.Under Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
17 Oct 195074.50 21 Oct 2003Philippe Xavier Christian Ignace Marie Cardinal BarbarinArchbishop Emeritus of Lyon, France
20 Jan 196362.24 7 Dec 2024Domenico Cardinal BattagliaArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
17 Aug 196163.66 7 Dec 2024Ignace Cardinal Bessi DogboArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
25 Feb 194778.14 18 Feb 2012Giuseppe Cardinal BetoriArchbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
29 Oct 194876.46 14 Feb 2015Charles Maung Cardinal Bo, S.D.B.Archbishop of Yangon, Myanmar
11 Jun 195272.84 7 Dec 2024Vicente Cardinal Bokalic Iglic, C.M.Archbishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
20 Mar 194976.07 21 Oct 2003Josip Cardinal BozanićArchbishop Emeritus of Zagreb, Croatia
7 Mar 194976.11 22 Feb 2014Leopoldo José Cardinal Brenes SolórzanoArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
24 Sep 195668.56 30 Sep 2023Stephen Cardinal BrislinArchbishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
30 Jun 194876.79 20 Nov 2010Raymond Leo Cardinal BurkePrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura
23 Nov 196856.40 30 Sep 2023François-Xavier Cardinal Bustillo, O.F.M. Conv.Bishop of Ajaccio, France
13 Feb 198045.17 7 Dec 2024Mykola Cardinal Bychok, C.Ss.R.Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia
11 Oct 195569.51 7 Dec 2024Luis Gerardo Cardinal Cabrera Herrera, O.F.M.Archbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
15 Oct 194579.50 24 Mar 2006Antonio Cardinal Cañizares LloveraArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain
1 Sep 195074.62 27 Aug 2022Oscar Cardinal CantoniBishop of Como, Italy
28 Feb 195075.13 7 Dec 2024Carlos Gustavo Cardinal Castillo MattasoglioArchbishop of Lima, Peru
10 Mar 195768.10 7 Dec 2024Fernando Natalio Cardinal Chomalí GaribArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
7 Aug 195965.69 30 Sep 2023Stephen Cardinal Chow Sau-yan, S.J.Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
16 Jul 194876.75 14 Feb 2015Manuel José Cardinal Macário do Nascimento ClementePatriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
20 Sep 196559.57 30 Sep 2023José Cardinal Cobo CanoArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
16 Jan 194778.25 18 Feb 2012Thomas Christopher Cardinal CollinsArchbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
20 Jul 196757.74 27 Aug 2022Paulo Cezar Cardinal CostaArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
21 Jul 194579.73 28 Jun 2018Joseph Cardinal CouttsArchbishop Emeritus of Karachi, Pakistan
19 Mar 194976.07 19 Nov 2016Blase Joseph Cardinal CupichArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Jul 194678.74 5 Oct 2019Michael F. Cardinal Czerny, S.J.Prefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
2 Mar 195966.12 7 Dec 2024Pablo Virgilio Siongco Cardinal DavidBishop of Kalookan, Philippines
4 Jan 195471.28 28 Jun 2018Angelo Cardinal De DonatisMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
17 Jun 194777.83 19 Nov 2016Jozef Cardinal De KeselArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
5 May 194876.94 14 Feb 2015John Atcherley Cardinal DewArchbishop Emeritus of Wellington, New Zealand
23 May 194975.90 24 Nov 2007Daniel Nicholas Cardinal DiNardoArchbishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
27 Nov 196757.38 27 Aug 2022Virgilio Cardinal do Carmo da Silva, S.D.B.Archbishop of Díli, Timor-Leste
6 Feb 195075.19 18 Feb 2012Timothy Michael Cardinal DolanArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
22 Jun 195371.81 18 Feb 2012Willem Jacobus Cardinal EijkArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
25 Jun 195272.81 21 Oct 2003Péter Cardinal ErdőArchbishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
2 Sep 194777.62 19 Nov 2016Kevin Joseph Cardinal FarrellPrefect of the Dicastery for the Laity, the Family and Life
18 Jul 196262.74 30 Sep 2023Victor Manuel Cardinal FernándezPrefect of the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith
21 Aug 196064.65 30 Sep 2023Ángel Cardinal Fernández Artime, S.D.B.Pro-Prefect of the Dicastery for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
20 Jan 195372.24 27 Aug 2022Filipe Neri António Sebastião do Rosário Cardinal FerrãoArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
15 Apr 194679.00 18 Feb 2012Fernando Cardinal FiloniGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
11 Nov 195173.43 30 Sep 2023Sebastian Cardinal FrancisBishop of Penang, Malaysia
15 Nov 194975.42 14 Feb 2015Arlindo Cardinal Gomes FurtadoBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
27 Oct 196559.47 28 Nov 2020Mauro Maria Cardinal Gambetti, O.F.M. Conv.President of the Fabric of St. Peter
11 Jul 194876.76 5 Oct 2019Juan de la Caridad Cardinal García RodríguezArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
25 Jun 195767.81 27 Aug 2022William Cardinal Goh Seng ChyeArchbishop of Singapore
20 Feb 195768.15 28 Nov 2020Mario Cardinal GrechSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
7 Dec 194777.36 28 Nov 2020Wilton Daniel Cardinal GregoryArchbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
7 Oct 195569.52 30 Sep 2023Claudio Cardinal GugerottiPrefect of the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches
20 Oct 194975.49 24 Nov 2012James Michael Cardinal HarveyArchpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
9 Aug 195866.68 5 Oct 2019Jean-Claude Cardinal Hollerich, S.J.Archbishop of Luxembourg
10 Nov 195866.43 28 Nov 2020Antoine Cardinal KambandaArchbishop of Kigali, Rwanda
1 Nov 195866.46 7 Dec 2024Tarcisio Isao Cardinal Kikuchi, S.V.D.Archbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
15 Mar 195075.08 20 Nov 2010Kurt Cardinal KochPrefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Christian Unity
11 Aug 197351.68 7 Dec 2024George Jacob Cardinal KoovakadPrefect of the Dicastery for Interreligious Dialogue
27 Jun 194975.80 14 Feb 2015Francis Xavier Kriengsak Cardinal KovithavanijArchbishop Emeritus of Bangkok, Thailand
25 Nov 196361.39 28 Jun 2018Konrad Cardinal KrajewskiPrefect of the Dicastery for the Service of Charity
22 Dec 194579.31 22 Feb 2014Jean-Pierre Cardinal KutwaArchbishop Emeritus of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
27 Jul 195767.72 22 Feb 2014Gérald Cyprien Cardinal Lacroix, I.S.P.X.Archbishop of Québec, Canada
29 Nov 195866.38 22 Feb 2014Chibly Cardinal LangloisBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
30 Jun 197153.79 7 Dec 2024Frank Cardinal LeoArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
1 Jul 196460.79 28 Nov 2020Augusto Paolo Cardinal LojudiceArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
19 May 195272.91 5 Oct 2019Cristóbal Cardinal López Romero, S.D.B.Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco
3 Mar 194976.12 28 Jun 2018Thomas Aquino Manyo Cardinal MaedaArchbishop of Osaka-Takamatsu, Japan
19 Dec 196163.32 14 Feb 2015Soane Patita Paini Cardinal MafiBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
31 Jan 197253.21 7 Dec 2024Rolandas Cardinal MakrickasCoadjutor Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
7 Mar 195273.11 14 Feb 2015Dominique François Joseph Cardinal MambertiPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
7 Jun 197450.86 27 Aug 2022Giorgio Cardinal Marengo, I.M.C.Prefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia
8 Jul 195173.77 27 Aug 2022Adalberto Cardinal Martínez FloresArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
5 May 194777.94 28 Jun 2018António Augusto Cardinal dos Santos MartoBishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
21 Sep 195371.57 20 Nov 2010Reinhard Cardinal MarxArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Jun 196361.84 7 Dec 2024Dominique Joseph Cardinal Mathieu, O.F.M. Conv.Archbishop of Teheran-Ispahan, Iran
5 Feb 195471.19 27 Aug 2022Robert Walter Cardinal McElroyArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
15 Dec 196559.33 5 Oct 2019José Tolentino Cardinal Calaça de MendonçaPrefect of the Dicastery for Culture and Education
22 May 194678.90 14 Feb 2015Francesco Cardinal MontenegroArchbishop Emeritus of Agrigento, Italy
10 Jan 196461.26 30 Sep 2023Stephen Ameyu Martin Cardinal MullaArchbishop of Juba, South Sudan
31 Dec 194777.29 22 Feb 2014Gerhard Ludwig Cardinal MüllerPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
7 Sep 195668.61 7 Dec 2024Ladislav Cardinal Nemet, S.V.D.Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
8 Nov 194579.44 22 Feb 2014Vincent Gerard Cardinal NicholsArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
1 Jan 194679.29 24 Nov 2007John Cardinal NjueArchbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya
1 Feb 195075.21 20 Nov 2010Kazimierz Cardinal NyczArchbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
14 Mar 196758.09 19 Nov 2016Dieudonné Cardinal Nzapalainga, C.S.Sp.Archbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
1 Mar 196362.12 27 Aug 2022Peter Ebere Cardinal OkpalekeBishop of Ekwulobia, Nigeria
21 Apr 194678.98 28 Jun 2017Juan José Cardinal Omella OmellaArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
16 May 194579.91 19 Nov 2016Carlos Cardinal Osoro SierraArchbishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain
31 Dec 194579.29 22 Feb 2014Philippe Nakellentuba Cardinal OuédraogoArchbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
17 Jan 195570.25 22 Feb 2014Pietro Cardinal ParolinSecretary of State
15 Nov 194777.42 20 Nov 2010Albert Malcolm Ranjith Cardinal Patabendige DonArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
19 Aug 194876.66 28 Jun 2018Giuseppe Cardinal PetrocchiArchbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila, Italy
30 Jan 194679.21 30 Sep 2023Christophe Louis Yves Georges Cardinal PierreApostolic Nuncio to United States of America
21 Apr 196559.98 30 Sep 2023Pierbattista Cardinal Pizzaballa, O.F.M.Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
29 Nov 194777.38 22 Feb 2014Mario Aurelio Cardinal PoliArchbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Nov 196163.42 27 Aug 2022Anthony Cardinal PoolaArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
14 Sep 195569.59 30 Sep 2023Robert Francis Cardinal Prevost, O.S.A.Prefect of the Dicastery for Bishops
8 Sep 194579.60 26 Nov 1994Vinko Cardinal PuljićArchbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
22 Aug 194579.65 7 Dec 2024Timothy Peter Joseph Cardinal Radcliffe, O.P.Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nomi di Gesù e Maria in Via Lata
16 Jul 194777.75 5 Oct 2019Alvaro Leonel Cardinal Ramazzini ImeriBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
26 Nov 197054.39 7 Dec 2024Baldassare Cardinal ReinaVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
29 Jan 196758.21 7 Dec 2024Roberto Cardinal RepoleArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
9 Feb 195768.18 19 Nov 2016John Cardinal Ribat, M.S.C.Archbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
2 Mar 194976.12 24 Nov 2007José Francisco Cardinal Robles OrtegaArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
21 Oct 195965.48 19 Nov 2016Sérgio Cardinal da RochaArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
6 Mar 195075.11 27 Aug 2022Arthur Cardinal RochePrefect of the Dicastery for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
11 Aug 195866.68 30 Sep 2023Ángel Sixto Cardinal Rossi, S.J.Archbishop of Córdoba, Argentina
3 Mar 196263.12 30 Sep 2023Luis José Cardinal Rueda AparicioArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
31 May 196064.87 30 Sep 2023Protase Cardinal RugambwaArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
4 Jul 194579.78 24 Nov 2007Stanisław Cardinal RyłkoArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
9 Feb 196461.18 30 Sep 2023Grzegorz Wojciech Cardinal RyśArchbishop of Łódź, Poland
4 Jul 194975.78 28 Jun 2018Louis Raphaël I Cardinal SakoPatriarch of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Jun 194579.83 20 Nov 2010Robert Cardinal SarahPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
21 Sep 194975.57 24 Nov 2007Odilo Pedro Cardinal SchererArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
22 Dec 194777.31 28 Nov 2020Marcello Cardinal SemeraroPrefect of the Dicastery for the Causes of Saints
14 Jul 194876.75 14 Feb 2015Berhaneyesus Demerew Cardinal Souraphiel, C.M.Archbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
6 Sep 196064.61 7 Dec 2024Jaime Cardinal Spengler, O.F.M.Archbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Nov 195074.44 27 Aug 2022Leonardo Ulrich Cardinal Steiner, O.F.M.Archbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Jul 195965.78 14 Feb 2015Daniel Fernando Cardinal Sturla Berhouet, S.D.B.Archbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
9 Jul 195074.77 5 Oct 2019Ignatius Cardinal Suharyo HardjoatmodjoArchbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia
21 Jun 195767.82 24 Nov 2012Luis Antonio Gokim Cardinal TaglePro-Prefect of the Dicastery for Evangelization
23 Jun 195074.81 22 Feb 2014Orani João Cardinal Tempesta, O. Cist.Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Jun 195965.83 24 Nov 2012Baselios Cleemis (Isaac) Cardinal ThottunkalMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
3 May 195272.95 19 Nov 2016Joseph William Cardinal Tobin, C.Ss.R.Archbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
13 Jun 195470.84 28 Jun 2018Désiré Cardinal TsarahazanaArchbishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
3 Feb 194778.20 30 Sep 2023Emil Paul Cardinal TscherrigApostolic Nuncio
11 Oct 194876.51 21 Oct 2003Peter Kodwo Appiah Cardinal TurksonChancellor of the Roman Curia - Other
10 Mar 196263.10 7 Dec 2024Jean-Paul Cardinal Vesco, O.P.Archbishop of Alger, Algeria
18 Aug 195668.66 18 Feb 2012Rainer Maria Cardinal WoelkiArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Nov 195173.41 27 Aug 2022Lazzaro Cardinal You Heung-sikPrefect of the Dicastery for the Clergy
5 Jan 194679.28 19 Nov 2016Mario Cardinal ZenariApostolic Nuncio to Syria
11 Oct 195569.51 5 Oct 2019Matteo Maria Cardinal ZuppiArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
Note: Cardinals that reach the age of 80 before the day the Holy See becomes vacant may not vote in a conclave.
136 Cardinal Electors of 252 living Cardinals. This table was last updated on 7 Apr 2025.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 7 Apr 2025