Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matteo Maria Cardinal Zuppi

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Egidio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1955 Born
9 May 198125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Palestrina, Italy
15 Nov 198833.0IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Jan 201256.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Jan 201256.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
14 Apr 201256.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
27 Oct 201560.0AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
12 Dec 201560.1InstalledArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
5 Oct 201963.9Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201963.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Egidio
11 Jan 202064.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Egidio

MicroData Summary for Matteo Maria Zuppi (VIAF: 233412342)
Matteo Maria Cardinal Zuppi (born ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bologna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • c34: CB, 15 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,415
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2015
  • i: CB, 4 Nov 2015
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast