Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Livio Corazza

Bishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1953 Born
1 May 198127.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
21 Jun 198127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
23 Jan 201864.1AppointedBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
17 Mar 201864.3Ordained BishopBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy
22 Apr 201864.4InstalledBishop of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Livio Corazza
Bishop Livio Corazza (born ) Bishop of Forli-Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePordenone
Ordained BishopSanto Stefano, Cathedral, Concordia Sagittaria, Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Forli-Bertinoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2018
  • od/c1: CB, 23 Jan 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Jan 2018
  • c2+: CB, 25 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast