Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvano Cardinal Piovanelli

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria delle Grazie a Via Trionfale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1924Born
13 Jul 194723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
28 May 198258.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
28 May 198258.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
24 Jun 198258.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
18 Mar 198359.0AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
25 May 198561.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198561.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria delle Grazie a Via Trionfale
21 Mar 200177.0RetiredArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
9 Jul 201692.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvano Piovanelli (VIAF: 3609445)
Silvano Cardinal Piovanelli (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRonta di Mugello
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Fleurs, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
  • a cardinal for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Jun 2021

Quantcast