Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Maniago

Auxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}

Titular Bishop of Satafi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1959 BornFirenze
19 Apr 198425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
18 Jul 200344.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
18 Jul 200344.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafi
8 Sep 200344.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafi

MicroData Summary for Claudio Maniago:
Bishop Claudio Maniago (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014