Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Maria Cardinal della Somaglia

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1744BornPiacenza, Italy
178742.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
2 Jun 178742.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 178844.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
21 Dec 178844.4Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
1 Jun 179550.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 179551.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
30 Oct 180056.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
20 Jul 180157.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
20 May 181469.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
26 Sep 181470.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
2 Oct 181874.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
21 Dec 181874.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 May 182075.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
23 Jan 182479.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
1 Oct 182682.2AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
2 Apr 183085.7DiedArchivist of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Giulio Maria della Somaglia:
Giulio Maria Cardinal della Somaglia (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
  • a cardinal for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014