Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Maria d’Agostino

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1756Born
11 Mar 178023.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 182367.0SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
17 Nov 182367.6ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
23 Nov 182367.6Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
18 Jul 183579.2DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria d’Agostino
Bishop Pietro Maria d’Agostino (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSciacca

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,823, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast