Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Filonardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1753BornRoma
22 Dec 179946.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Dec 179946.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 182369.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
1 Jun 182369.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
3 Jul 182672.8AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
3 May 183480.6DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Filonardi:
Archbishop Filippo Filonardi (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 93, and Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013