Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Bezzi

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1749Born
8 Nov 177222.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182474.4AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
24 Jun 182474.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
16 Mar 182878.2DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Bezzi
Bishop Felice Bezzi (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolentino

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1824, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018