Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Nembrini Pironi Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1768BornAncona
5 Jun 180334.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182455.4AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
7 Jun 182455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
27 Jul 182960.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 182960.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
5 Dec 183769.0DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Nembrini Pironi Gonzaga
Cesare Cardinal Nembrini Pironi Gonzaga (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
  • a cardinal for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 73
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1824, Number 33
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1829

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jun 2016