Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Zoppi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1765BornCannobio
20 Dec 178823.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 182358.4AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
23 Nov 182358.5Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
1 Oct 183267.3ResignedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
15 Apr 183367.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
Apr 1841³75.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Zoppi:
Bishop Francesco Maria Zoppi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Massa Carrara

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 202, and Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013