Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli

Dioecesis Massensis-Apuana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mario Vaccari, O.F.M., Bishop
  • Eugenio Binini, Bishop Emeritus
  • Giovanni Santucci, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 23 February 1988
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pisa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,174 (453 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Toscana
  • Official Web Site: http://www.massacarrara.chiesacattolica.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Via Francesco M. Zoppi 14, 54100 Massa, Italia
  • Telephone: 0585.89.90.210
  • Fax: 0585.81.02.87

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Massa Carrara
18 February 1822ErectedDiocese of Massa Carrara (erected)
Diocese of Apuania
20 July 1939Name ChangedDiocese of Massa Carrara Diocese of Apuania
5 February 1955Territory LostDiocese of Apuania (S. Nicolai in Caprigliola and of S. Martini in Albiano) Diocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
26 July 1959Territory LostDiocese of Apuania (S. Justin in Rocchetta Vara, S. John the Baptist in Beverone, S. Anna in Carbugliaga, S. Martin in Cavanella Vara, S. John the Baptist in Stadomelli, S. John the Baptist in S uvero, St. Mary Assumption in the Chalice al Cornoviglio, St. Mary in the ...) Diocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato
26 July 1959Territory AddedDiocese of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato (S. Nicolai in the village of Oaprigliola and S. Martini in the village of Albiano Magra) Diocese of Apuania
Diocese of Massa
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Apuania Diocese of Massa
Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli
23 February 1988UnitedDiocese of Massa
Diocese of Pontremoli
Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli
5 September 1992Territory LostDiocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli (Camporgiano, Careggine, Castelnuovo Garfagnana, Fabbriche di Vallico, Fosciandora, Gallicano, Giuncugnano, Minucciano, Molazzana, Piazza al Serchio, Pieve Fosciana, S. Romano Garfagnana, Sillano, Stazzema, Vagli Sotto, Vergemoli, and Villa Collemandina) Archdiocese of Lucca

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Massa Carrara
1886113,148.0%3190156OTC
Diocese of Apuania
1949198,000200,00099.0%23435269736216ap1951
1959196,070196,50099.8%2153625178149387212ap1960
1970203,290203,45499.9%1923722988746354218ap1971
1980204,495205,50599.5%1783621495546303222ap1981
Diocese of Massa
Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli
1990237,073238,56099.4%2324027287162339352ap1991
1999199,691200,97199.4%157492069691452270246ap2000
2000198,000199,35499.3%147331801,1001438268246ap2001
2001197,775199,37599.2%154281821,0861838252246ap2002
2002200,710201,80099.5%160271871,0731836286246ap2003
2003198,000200,00099.0%143311741,1371835234246ap2004
2004197,000199,00099.0%138341721,1451840231244ap2005
2013200,390205,77097.4%120241441,3912630190244ap2014
2016201,000206,75097.2%103221251,6082826182244ap2017
2019201,820206,05097.9%99201191,6953023166244ap2020
2021203,500207,05098.3%107181251,6282820160244ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Massa Carrara
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 759
  • Diocese of Apuania
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 827, to Page 829
  • Diocese of Massa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 443, and Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 13 Feb 2024