Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Bernardi

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Carrara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1799Born
23 Mar 182222.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 185657.1AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
22 Jun 185657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
23 Dec 187172.6DiedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Bernardi
Bishop Giacomo Bernardi (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Carrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Anna Pelago, Diocese of Modena
Ordained BishopLe Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017