Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Palermo, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1801Born
20 Sep 182322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
23 Mar 185554.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
25 Mar 185554.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
29 Oct 185655.7DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Palermo (VIAF: 89263779)
Bishop Giuseppe Palermo O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalemi, Diocese of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 463
  • c34: CB, 18 Feb 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017