Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico de Rossi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1805Born
19 Dec 182924.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 185650.1SelectedBishop of Caserta, Italy
16 Jun 185650.5ConfirmedBishop of Caserta, Italy
22 Jun 185650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
12 Jun 189387.5ResignedBishop of Caserta, Italy
12 Jun 189387.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
1897¹91.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico de Rossi
Archbishop Enrico de Rossi (born , died 1897) Bishop Emeritus of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopLe Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 108, and Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017