Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Emmanuele Nicolo Cardinal Lambruschini, B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1776Born
1 Jan 179922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
8 Mar 181639.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
6 Sep 181943.3SelectedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
27 Sep 181943.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
3 Oct 181943.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
14 Nov 182650.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
26 Jun 183054.1ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
5 Jul 183054.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
30 Sep 183155.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 183155.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
24 Feb 183255.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
1833²56.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Regular Discipline
21 Nov 183458.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
11 Dec 183458.5AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
12 Jan 183659.6AppointedSecretary of State
24 Jan 184265.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
1 Jun 184670.0RetiredSecretary of State
8 Jun 184771.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
11 Jun 184771.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
27 Jun 185377.1ResignedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
12 May 185477.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Emmanuele Nicolo Lambruschini (VIAF: 19668761)
Luigi Emmanuele Nicolo Cardinal Lambruschini B. (born , died ) Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSestri Levante
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
  • a cardinal for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 44
  • c4: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 110, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1831
  • xsta/x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 10, and Page 19, and Page 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Mar 2018