Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Tizzani, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1809BornRoma
15 Mar 183424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
3 Apr 184333.8AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
18 Apr 184333.8Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
14 Nov 184839.4ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy
30 Mar 185545.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
15 Jan 188676.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
19 Jan 189282.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Tizzani:
Archbishop Vincenzo Tizzani C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 416
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013