Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pietro Raffaele Castellani, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1798BornRoma, Italy
15 Aug 181618.4ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
23 Sep 182022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
8 Jul 183941.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
14 Jul 183941.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
10 Dec 185456.8DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Pietro Raffaele Castellani
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pietro Raffaele Castellani O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • ab/ob/d: MW, 10 Dec 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016