Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Venturi

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1788BornCostacciaro
17 Apr 181325.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 184456.2AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
28 Jul 184456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
14 Jul 185466.2DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Venturi (VIAF: 89524077)
Bishop Mariano Venturi (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1853
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016