Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pio Bighi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1780Born
4 Jun 180322.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 184767.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
10 Oct 184767.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
23 Aug 185372.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
31 Aug 185473.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Philippi

MicroData Summary for Pio Bighi (VIAF: 89073888)
Archbishop Pio Bighi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Philippi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Italy
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 356, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017