Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Luigi Speranza

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1801BornPiario
18 Sep 182422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
7 Aug 185351.6SelectedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
19 Dec 185352.0ConfirmedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
8 Jan 185452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
4 Jun 187977.5DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Luigi Speranza (VIAF: 89571209)
Bishop Pietro Luigi Speranza (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016