Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Ligi-Bussi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1799Born
26 Dec 182526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
17 Feb 185151.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
23 Feb 185151.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
9 Sep 186262.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Iconium

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ligi-Bussi (VIAF: 304913280)
Archbishop Antonio Ligi-Bussi O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Iconium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino, Italy
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Jan 2017